Sl.No | Name Of Principal | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
1 | Smt. N.Balodhi I/C | 07.03.2014 | 31.03.2014 |
2 | Sh A.K.Upadhaya I/C | 31.03.2014 | 17.06.2014 |
3 | Sh Rajiv Ratan Shukla | 17.06.2014 | 17.06.2016 |
4 | Sh Bal krishna I/C | 22.06.2016 | 25.11.2016 |
5 | Sh Sanjeev Jhajharia | 25.11.2016 | 26.09.2019 |
6 | Sh H.S Jeena | 27.09.2019 | 08.12.2019 |
7 | Sh Kundal Singh Digari | 09.12.2019 | Till Date |